IL SB3521 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the evidence-based funding provisions of the School Code. Allows district intervention money to be added to an organizational unit's base funding minimum if the organizational unit (i) is operating under an Independent Authority or is subject to State Board of Education control pursuant to a court order for at least 4 school years; (ii) was designated as a Tier 1 or Tier 2 organizational unit in the previous school year; (iii) is operating under financial planning approved by the Independent Authority or the governing board of the organizational unit if under State Board control pursuant to a court order, and (iv) has made sufficient progress and achieved sufficient stability in the areas of governance, academic growth, and finances. Sets forth the procedures for adding district intervention money to the base funding minimum, including requiring General Assembly approval. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ST FUNDING FORMULA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |