IL SB3513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to the Stay of Driver's License Suspension for Child Support Arrearage Law. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Includes a statement of legislative purpose. Provides that in any proceeding to enforce arrearages in child support payments or orders, the obligor shall have the right to petition the court or child support administrative body for an order to stay the suspension of driver's license ("stay order") lasting 12 months after the date of the stay order. Provides that the court or the child support administrative body shall oversee the stay order and shall review the stay order every 90 days to determine if the obligor has started to pay child support if already employed, gains employment, or has made specified efforts to gain employment. Provides that the court shall impose specified requirements. Adds other provisions governing: employment, business, or self-employment income; additional issues, temporary disability or incapacity; support order requirements; termination of stay order for noncompliance; stay order extensions; and other matters. Provides that if the new provisions are inconsistent with Sections of the Code pertaining to notice and hearing requirements currently in place for the suspension of a driver's license for nonpayment, the new provisions control.
Title
VEH CD-LICENSE-CHILD SUPPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED |
2018-05-09 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-001 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-001-001 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-003-002 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |