IL SB3513 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Provides that school student records or information contained in those records may be released to SHOCAP committee members who fall within the meaning of "state and local officials and authorities" for the purpose of identifying criminal trends and victim information to prevent outbreaks of violence by and against students. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the SHOCAP committee shall adopt, by a majority of the members, criteria to identify criminal trends in order to prevent outbreaks of violence by or against students and criteria to determine when sharing of juvenile victim information would deter further acts of violence by or against juveniles. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-INFO-DISCLOSE-SCHOOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 8, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-19 | Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee | |
2010-04-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-19 | First Reading | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-16 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2010-04-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; E. Jones III | |
2010-04-15 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-04 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |