IL SB3505 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Provides that any renewal of a certified charter must include a union neutrality clause. Requires a union neutrality clause to be included in a charter school proposal. Defines "union neutrality clause". Effective immediately.
Title
CHARTER SCH-UNION NEUTRALITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Charter Schools |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3505&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3505.htm |