IL SB3479 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Changes the definition of the term "dangerous conduct" to mean threatening behavior or conduct that places another individual in reasonable expectation of being physically harmed (rather than harmed), or conduct evincing a person's inability to provide, without the assistance of family or outside help, for his or her basic physical needs so as to guard himself or herself from serious harm (rather than, or a person's inability to provide, without the assistance of family or outside help, for his or her basic physical needs so as to guard himself or herself from serious harm). Effective immediately.
Title
MHDD CD-DANGEROUS CONDUCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-08 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3479&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3479.htm |