IL SB3463 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 4:00 pm in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that on the date that the juvenile is adjudicated delinquent, the juvenile court judge shall schedule a date to enter the automatic expungement order. Provides that the juvenile must be notified but shall not be required to be present for the scheduled court date when automatic expungement is to be ordered.
Title
JUV CT-AUTOMATIC EXPUNGEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |