IL SB3461 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that subject to appropriations the Department of Human Services shall designate a member of its staff as Autism Spectrum Disorder Project Coordinator to address issues related to autism spectrum disorders (ASD). Establishes the project coordinator's duties including working in conjunction with members of the Illinois Autism Task Force; coordinating any and all State governmental efforts concerning ASD; and promoting awareness of ASD.
Title
DHS-AUTISM PROJECT COORDINATOR
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Susan Garrett [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Sen. Edward Maloney [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-003-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-02-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |