IL SB3443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides that the application for appointment and commission as a notary public shall include the applicant's business address if different than the applicant's residence address. Provides that an applicant's signature on a notary public application authorizes the Secretary of State to conduct a criminal background check of the applicant. Modifies provisions concerning changes causing a notary's commission to cease to be in effect. Provides that the performance of a notarial act while the commission of a notary is suspended or revoked is a prohibited act. Provides that upon the filing of any claim against a notary public or upon payment to any individual harmed as a result of a breach of duty by the notary public, the entity that has issued the bond for the notary shall notify the Secretary of whether payment was made and the circumstances which led to the claim. Adds provisions and requirements concerning reprimand, suspension, and revocation of a notary's Commission. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
NOTARY-SUSPENSION & REVOCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0809 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 312 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 4-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 6-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 7-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 312 | 7-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |