IL SB3439 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Securities Law of 1953. Eliminates reference to face amount certificate contracts. Provides that, in addition to existing disciplinary penalties, the registrations of dealers and advisers may be limited or conditioned for failure to comply with statutory requirements. Provides that administrative actions may be brought by the Secretary of State within 3 years from the time the Secretary of State had notice of facts that, in the exercise of reasonable diligence would lead to actual knowledge of the violation. Removes provision barring administrative actions 5 years after the date on which the alleged violation occurred. Establishes protections against the financial exploitation of persons 60 years of age or older and persons subject to the Illinois Adult Protective Services Act. Requires certain licensees to report incidents of potential exploitation.
Title
SECURITIES VULNERABLE ADULTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 11.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 12.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 2.14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |