IL SB3437 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Residential Real Property Disclosure Act. Provides that a lender, or agent of a lending company, when offering terms for a mortgage note for the purchase of a manufactured home, shall disclose: (1) any affiliation between the landlord and the lending company; (2) that the loan is a chattel loan; (3) that the terms of a chattel loan prohibit refinancing; and (4) any other reason that prohibits refinancing.
Title
MANUFACTURED HOMES-REFINANCING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |