IL SB3436 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Aid to the Aged, Blind or Disabled Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the General Assembly finds it necessary to take measures to increase the amount of cash assistance provided to qualifying Illinoisans under the Aid to the Aged, Blind or Disabled (AABD) program to reach a standard compatible with health and well-being. Provides that the amount of AABD aid granted to a person shall be determined by the Department of Human Services in such a manner as to produce assistance payments that bring the person's total monthly income from countable sources, as determined by the Department, Supplemental Security Income (SSI) benefits, if applicable, and AABD aid to an amount that is: (i) no less than 85% of the federal poverty level in effect for the month aid is paid, beginning July 1, 2024; (ii) no less than 90% of the federal poverty level in effect for the month aid is paid, beginning July 1, 2025; (iii) no less than 95% of the federal poverty level for the month aid is paid, beginning July 1, 2026; and (iv) no less than 100% of the federal poverty level in effect for the month aid is paid, beginning on and after July 1, 2027. Provides that the amendatory Act shall not result in any reduction in the amount of aid payable to a person determined eligible for aid prior to July 1, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB AID-AABD CASH ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3436&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3436.htm |