IL SB3429 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the State earned income tax credit shall be: (i) 19% of the federal tax credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2022 and beginning before January 1, 2023; and (ii) 20% of the federal credit for each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2023. Requires the Department of Revenue and certain institutions of higher education to provide certain notices concerning the federal and State earned income tax credits. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EARNED INCOME CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 170 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 170 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 170 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 170 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 170 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3429&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3429.htm |