IL SB3422 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Contains provisions concerning the apportionment to nonresidents of gains or losses on partnerships, trusts, or stock in Subchapter S corporations upon the sale, exchange, abandonment, liquidation, or other disposition of the interest in the partnership, trust, or stock.
Title
INC TX-PARTNERSHIP INTEREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3422&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3422.htm |