IL SB3401 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an addition modification in an amount equal to the deduction for qualified domestic production activities allowed under Section 199 of the Internal Revenue Code for the taxable year. Makes changes concerning the definition of "unitary business group". Provides that moneys attributable to those changes shall be deposited into the Bill Payment Trust Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Bill Payment Trust Fund. Provides that moneys in the Bill Payment Trust Fund shall be used to make payments to certain bona fide creditors of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-BILL PAYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3401&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3401.htm |