IL SB3388 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Crime Reduction Act of 2009. Adds definition of "offender" and deletes definition of "violent offender". Provides that an offender who is charged with or convicted of a probation-eligible offense (rather than a non-violent offender) may participate in the Adult Redeploy Illinois program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADULT REDEPLOY-VIOLENT OFFENDR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0999
2018-08-20SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-20SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-028-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73019020Amended CodeCitation Text
7301905Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback