IL SB3388 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Crime Reduction Act of 2009. Adds definition of "offender" and deletes definition of "violent offender". Provides that an offender who is charged with or convicted of a probation-eligible offense (rather than a non-violent offender) may participate in the Adult Redeploy Illinois program.
Title
ADULT REDEPLOY-VIOLENT OFFENDR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0999 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-028-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 190 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 190 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |