IL SB3383 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the energy efficiency, renewable energy and energy assistance programs.
Title
$OSFM FY14 OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3383&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/PDF/09900SB3383.pdf |