IL SB3377 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Requires the Department on Aging to develop and implement a dementia training program that must include instruction on the identification of people with dementia, risks such as wandering, communication impairments, elder abuse, and the best practices for interacting with people with dementia. Provides that initial training of 4 hours shall be completed at the start of employment with the Adult Protective Services division and shall cover several subjects, including: (i) dementia, psychiatric, and behavioral symptoms; (ii) communication issues, including how to communicate respectfully and effectively; and (iii) protocols for connecting people living with dementia to local care resources and professionals who are skilled in dementia care to encourage cross-referral and reporting regarding incidents of abuse. Provides that annual continuing education shall include 2 hours of dementia training covering the same subjects discussed during initial training. Grants the Department rulemaking authority.
Title
ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3377&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3377.htm |