IL SB3349 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act, the Criminal Code of 1961, the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Creates Offender Initiative Probation. Provides that whenever any person who has not previously been convicted of, or placed on probation or conditional discharge for, any felony offense, other than a violent offense, under the laws of this State, the laws of any other state, or the laws of the United States, pleads guilty to, or is found guilty of, a probationable felony offense of theft, retail theft, forgery, possession of a stolen motor vehicle, burglary, possession of burglary tools, possession of cannabis, possession of a controlled substance, or possession of methamphetamine, the court, with the consent of both the defendant and the State's Attorney, may, without entering a judgment, sentence the defendant to probation. Establishes the terms and conditions of the probation. Provides that upon fulfillment of the terms and conditions of probation, the court shall discharge the person and dismiss the proceedings against the person. Provides that upon violation of a term or condition of probation, the court may enter a judgment on its original finding of guilt and proceed as otherwise provided by law.
Title
CD CORR-INITIATIVE PROBATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1118 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-009-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 044-009-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2012-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-048-000 |
2012-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-001-000 |
2012-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-002-000 |
2012-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 24, 2012 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 646 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |