IL SB3341 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Precious Metal Purchasing Act. Provides that a person who is in the business of purchasing precious metal shall obtain a proof of ownership, create a record of the sale, and verify the identity of the seller. Provides that a person who is in the business of purchasing precious metal shall not pay for the precious metal in cash and shall record the method of payment. Requires the purchaser to keep a record of the sale for one year or, if the purchase amount is over $500, for 5 years. Provides that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a petty offense and subject to a fine not exceeding $500. Provides that the Attorney General may inspect records, investigate an alleged violation, and take action to collect civil penalties.
Title
PRECIOUS METAL PURCHASING ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Pam Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-01-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-01-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-12-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-12-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-11-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-11-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce; 006-000-000 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |