IL SB3339 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that each petition for nomination shall include an affidavit signed by the candidate, under oath, stating that the petition contains no fewer than the specified minimum number of signatures. Provides that the election authority with whom the petition for nomination would otherwise be filed may not accept for filing any petition for nomination that does not include the affidavit.
Title
ELEC CD-MINIMUM SIGNATURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Radogno |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Election Law |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-5.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 7-10.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 8-8.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |