IL SB3335 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Community Mental Health Reform Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, in partnership with the Department of Human Services, to revise administrative rules and other Department policies and practices concerning certification and service requirements for community mental health centers and behavioral health clinics. Provides that the primary goal of revising the administrative rules and Department policies is to develop a modernized regulatory framework that: (1) fosters the provision of services that results in the best mental health and health outcomes and is consistent with a Medicaid managed care environment; (2) enables innovation and integrated mental and physical health care; (3) harnesses the modern mental health workforce; and (4) reduces unnecessary process barriers that do not offer meaningful clinical value and that act as a barrier to treatment. Requires the Department of Human Services to revise administrative rules concerning the Medicaid Community Mental Health Services Program to be consistent with changes made to administrative rules concerning certification and service requirements for community mental health centers and behavioral health clinics. Contains provisions concerning reducing client mental health assessments; enabling workforce expertise for certain roles on multidisciplinary, team-based treatment models; streamlining fee-for-service documentation requirements to enable increased time for client care; the establishment of a working group of community mental health centers and behavioral health clinics; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH REFORM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3335&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3335.htm |