IL SB3333 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall create and maintain an online database and resource page on its website. Provides that the database and resource page shall contain mental health resources specifically geared toward first responders with the goal of connecting those persons with mental health resources related to crisis services, wellness, trauma information, nutrition, stress reduction, anxiety, depression, violence prevention, suicide prevention, and substance use and of encouraging information sharing among families of first responders, first responder organizations, first responder professional organizations, and first responders. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRST RESPONDER MNTL HLTH DATA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |