IL SB3317 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Candidate Information Privacy Act. Provides that the Executive Director of the State Board of Elections shall establish a secure portal through which a candidate may submit or revoke a request for the redaction or nondisclosure of his or her personal information from publicly-accessible databases maintained and administered by the Board. Sets forth procedures to request the redaction or nondisclosure of specified personal information and exceptions. Provides that a copy of the voter registration files maintained in the Statewide voter registration system and maintained by the election authority of each county shall be provided to a requester as redacted, except that a copy of the unredacted voter registration files shall be provided to specified individuals. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
CANDIDATE INFO PRIVACY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Elections |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3317&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3317.htm |