IL SB3308 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Prohibits charging retirees under the State employee and university retirement systems, or their survivors, premiums for dental and vision benefits under the group health benefits program. Effective July 1, 2010.
Title
ST GROUP INS-RETIREE PREMIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Benefit Enhancements | |
2010-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3308&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3308.htm |