IL SB3304 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Fire Protection Training Act. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal (rather than, not later than May 30th of each year, from funds appropriated for this purpose) shall reimburse the local governmental agencies or individuals participating in the training program in an amount equaling one-half of the total sum paid by them during the period established by the Office for tuition at training schools, salary of trainees while in school, necessary travel expenses, and room and board for each trainee from funds appropriated for this purpose. Provides that if a National Fire Protection Association standard exists for various criteria identified under the Act, the Office shall utilize and adopt, by procedures, directives, or rules that standard or those standards as the minimum standard requirements for that criteria. Provides that the Office shall establish procedures for the adoption of those applicable National Fire Protection Association standards. Provides that the Office may, in its discretion, adopt, amend, and repeal in part or in their entirety those procedures, directives, or rules as may be necessary to carry out the Act. Makes other changes.
Title
LOCAL GVT-FIRE PROTECTION
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0600 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 740 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 740 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |