IL SB3301 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Articulation Initiative Act. Requires all public institutions of higher education to participate in the Illinois Articulation Initiative through submission and review of their courses for statewide transfer consistency. Requires (i) all sending and receiving institutions to maintain a complete Illinois Articulation Initiative General Education Core Curriculum package to ensure seamless transfer; (ii) all institutions to maintain up to 4 core courses in an Illinois Articulation Initiative major, provided the institution has equivalent majors and courses; and (iii) all institutions to provide faculty, as appointed by the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board, to serve on panels in the review of courses. Provides that all courses approved for Illinois Articulation Initiative codes must be directly transferable either as a part of the General Education Core Curriculum package or as equivalent major courses, insofar as a specific major is offered at the receiving institution. Provides that students receiving the General Education Core Curriculum package must not be required to take additional freshmen or sophomore level general education courses and must be able to transfer seamlessly. Sets forth the duties of the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board.
Title
ILL ARTICULATION INITIATIVE
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0636 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |