IL SB3297 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning resident bidders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-REAL PROP-DISCLOSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1146
2013-01-18SenateEffective Date January 18, 2013
2013-01-18SenateGovernor Approved
2013-01-10SenateSent to the Governor
2013-01-03SenatePassed Both Houses
2013-01-03SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-001-000
2013-01-03SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2013-01-03SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2013-01-03SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2013-01-03SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Revenue
2013-01-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2013-01-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2013-01-02SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett
2012-12-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 2, 2013
2012-12-05SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2012-12-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-038-000
2012-12-05House3/5 Vote Required
2012-12-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000
2012-12-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2012-12-03HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2012-11-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2012-11-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013
2012-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2012-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2012-11-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-03-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-03-29HouseFirst Reading
2012-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2012-03-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2012-03-29HouseArrived in House
2012-03-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2012-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2012
2012-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2012-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2012
2012-03-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Procurement; 007-000-000
2012-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2012-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Procurement
2012-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2012-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
2012-03-09SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
2012-03-08SenateHeld in Procurement
2012-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2012-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Procurement
2012-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2012-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
2012-02-27SenateAssigned to Procurement
2012-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2012-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050045-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3297&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3297.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3297sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3297sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3297eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3297ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3297enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/97/097-1146.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/senate/09700SB3297_03292012_056000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700SB3297_12052012_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/senate/09700SB3297_01032013_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback