IL SB3296 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Secretary of State or the Executive Ethics Commission, after the adjudication of a violation regarding sexual harassment under the Lobbyist Registration Act for which an investigation was initiated by the Inspector General appointed by the Secretary of State, are authorized to temporarily suspend or terminate any person, or lobbying entity for which that person is employed, registered under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Amends the Secretary of State Act. Authorizes the Secretary of State Inspector General to file pleadings with the Executive Ethics Commission, through the Attorney General, if the Attorney General finds that reasonable cause exists to believe that a violation regarding acts of sexual harassment by a lobbyist occurred. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that failure to cooperate in an investigation initiated by the Secretary of State Inspector General, or a finding by the Inspector General of a violation regarding sexual harassment, shall give the Secretary of State discretion to temporarily suspend or terminate any person, or lobbying entity for which that person is employed, registered under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS-LOBBYIST SEXUAL HARASSMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |