IL SB3293 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Records Act. Provides that a unit of local government or a school district located in a county with a population of 100,000 or more shall have a website containing the following information for the current calendar year: (1) procedures to apply for building permits and zoning variances; (2) contracts with lobbying firms; (3) rules governing the award of contracts; (4) bids and contracts worth $25,000 or more; (5) campaign contributions made by a vendor; and (6) all vendor disclosures of relationships to any employee of that unit of local government or school district. Provides that any citizen who is a resident of the unit of local government or school district may bring a mandamus or injunction action to compel the unit of local government or school district to comply with the Internet posting requirements. Provides a posting in perpetuity clause. Limits home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Contains a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT-POST RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 205 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3293&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3293.htm |