IL SB3291 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Defines "unmanned aircraft systems". Provides that the regulation of unmanned aircraft systems is an exclusive power and function of the State. Denies home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
UNMANNED AIRCRAFT SYSTEMS
Sponsors
Sen. James Clayborne [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0735 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-004-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |