IL SB3289 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wrongful Tree Cutting Act. Defines "land with a primary purpose of preservation or conservation". Provides that any party found to have intentionally cut or knowingly caused to be cut any timber or tree on land with a primary purpose of preservation or conservation that he or she did not have the legal right to cut or caused to be cut must pay the owner of the timber or tree 3 times stumpage value plus all remediation costs. Provides that nothing in the Act limits the rights provided under other law of an owner of land with a primary purpose of preservation or conservation. Provides that the court may not use the diminution of market value in determining damages. Provides that the court shall allow a plaintiff who prevails to recover the cost of expenses incurred. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TREECUTTING-CONSERVATION LAND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-005-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-000-004 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 185 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 185 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 185 | 2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 2.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 185 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |