IL SB3280 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Pension Code. Changes the membership of the board of trustees from 13 to 11. Provides that the Governor shall appoint 4 members (instead of 6 members). Makes changes in the provisions concerning terms of office for the appointed members. Terminates the terms of members of the Board who are appointed by the Governor, including temporary appointees, on the effective date of the amendatory Act and removes language that would allow the current members to hold over in office for 60 days.
Title
PEN CD-TRS-BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-10 | Postponed - Executive | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive | |
2010-03-10 | Held in Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2010-03-08 | To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3280&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3280.htm |