IL SB3263 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that it is an improper claims practice for a domestic, foreign, or alien company transacting business in this State to fail to pay applicable tax, title, and transfer fees for all first-party and third-party claims on a replacement vehicle in a private passenger automobile total loss vehicle claim if that act is committed knowingly in violation of the Code, has been committed with such frequency to indicate a persistent tendency to engage in that type of conduct, and is committed without just cause. Effective immediately.
Title
INSURANCE CODE-IMPROPER CLAIMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 154.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3263&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3263.htm |