IL SB3261 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abandoned Mobile Homes Act. Repeals and deletes provisions authorizing a municipality to remove and dispose of an abandoned mobile home within the municipality upon notice to each owner and each lienholder and provisions regarding various matters relating to the removal or disposal of an abandoned mobile home. Adds provisions authorizing a mobile home park owner or operator to commence a proceeding seeking a declaration by a court that a manufactured home has been abandoned and seeking removal of the manufactured home if specified conditions are met. Also adds provisions regarding: procedure; execution of judgments; disposition of property; responsibility for costs; and other matters. Defines "manufactured home resident" and "manufactured home owner". Makes corresponding changes in the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes other changes.
Title
ABANDONED MOBILE HOMES
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] |
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1083 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 117 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 10.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 117 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 35 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 40 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | 55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 117 | Act title | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 515 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-117.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |