IL SB3257 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. With respect to the apportionment of business income for persons other than residents, provides that, for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2010, the income shall be apportioned using the property factor, payroll factor, and sales factor. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-BUSINESS INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-08 | Postponed - Revenue | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3257&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3257.htm |