IL SB3250 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0944
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0944
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that all property upon which the first installment of taxes remains unpaid on the first installment date (now, June 1) shall be deemed delinquent and shall bear interest after the first installment date (now, June 1). Provides that all property upon which the second installment of taxes remains due and unpaid on the second installment date (now, September 1) shall be deemed delinquent and shall bear interest after the second installment date (now, September 1). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-INSTALLMENT DATE
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Rep. Emily McAsey [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0944 |
2012-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2012 |
2012-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001 |
2012-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2012-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-04-26 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-04-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |