IL SB3249 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1064
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1064
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
MINORITY/FEMALE BUS ENTERPRISE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-16 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1064 | |
2010-07-16 | Effective Date July 16, 2010 | |
2010-07-16 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-04-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-001 | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-03-25 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-25 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-03-25 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-03-24 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-24 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted; Sandoval | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Sandoval | |
2010-03-17 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rickey R. Hendon | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Sandoval | |
2010-03-12 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Louis S. Viverito | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-03-03 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-03 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-03-03 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-03-03 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-02-24 | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |