IL SB3244 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that, if a park district builds a new playground, the playground area and surface must meet the standards for playgrounds contained in the United States Department of Justice's 2010 ADA Standards for Accessible Design or any subsequent publication to those standards on accessible design by the Department of Justice.
Title
PARK DISTRICT CODE-PLAYGROUNDS
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3244&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3244.htm |