IL SB3233 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Intergovernmental Cooperation Act. Provides that no intergovernmental or interagency agreement or contract may be entered into, implemented, or given effect if the agreement's or contract's intent or effect is, among other requirements, to circumvent any limitation established by law pertaining to payroll certification under the State Finance Act or to authorize the payment of employees of the Office of the Governor out of appropriations other than those established for that purpose. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that, for the Office of the Governor, the certification on every State payroll voucher shall be required for expenditures from amounts appropriated to the Office of the Governor for payment of salaries of Governor's Office employees and executed by the Governor, or his or her designee, in addition to any other certifications or approvals which may be required by law to be made. Provides that in no event shall salaries of employees of the Office of the Governor be paid from appropriations other than those established for that purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPTROLLER-PAYROLL CERTIFY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 9.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 220 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |