IL SB3233 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Insurance Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Insurance shall study the frequency and economic impact of nonparticipating facility-based physician and provider claims concerning the issue of when a beneficiary, insured, or enrollee utilizes a participating network hospital or a participating network ambulatory surgery center and, due to any reason, in-network services for radiology, anesthesiology, pathology, emergency physician, or neonatology are unavailable and are provided by a nonparticipating facility-based physician or provider and the insurer's or health plan's responsibility to ensure that the beneficiary, insured, or enrollee incurs no greater out-of-pocket costs than the beneficiary, insured, or enrollee would have incurred with a participating physician or provider for covered services. Provides that the Department shall report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly no later than October 1, 2012. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that nothing in the provision concerning nonparticipating facility-based physicians and providers shall be interpreted to change the prudent layperson provisions with respect to emergency services under the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-HEALTH-EMERGENCY SERVIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1148 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 24, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 051-000-001 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-000-001 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-001 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance |
2013-01-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance |
2013-01-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 1, 3 - January 2, 2013 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2012-12-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-027-000 |
2012-12-05 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2012-12-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-12-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-12-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-12-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2012-12-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-12-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-12-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-11-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-11-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1405 | 1405-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |