IL SB3232 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Pending: House Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Pending: House Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abandoned Newborn Infant Protection Act. In a provision concerning hospital procedures with respect to a relinquished infant, provides that if a person who relinquished or a person claiming to be the parent of a newborn infant returns to reclaim the infant within 30 days after the infant was relinquished to a hospital, the hospital must inform such person of the name and contact information of the child welfare agency to whom custody of the infant was transferred. In a provision concerning child welfare agency procedures, requires the Department of Children and Family Services and child welfare agencies to initiate parental termination, guardianship, and adoption proceedings in accordance with the Adoption Act (rather than the Abandoned Newborn Infant Protection Act).
Title
ABANDONED INFANTS-HOSPITALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 2 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 2 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |