IL SB3205 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Technology Development Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may segregate a portion of the Treasurer's State investment portfolio that at no time shall be greater than 5% (rather than 2%) of the portfolio, in the Technology Development Account IIa. Provides further requirements regarding investment in Technology Development Account IIa. Provides that the Treasurer may solicit proposals from entities to manage and be the general partner of a separate fund consisting of investments from private sector investors that must invest, at the direction of the general partner (rather than Treasurer), in tandem with Technology Development Account IIa in a pro-rata portion. Provides that moneys in Technology Development Account IIa may be invested by the State Treasurer to provide venture capital to technology businesses, including co-investments. Provides that in no case shall more than 15% (rather than 10%) of the capital in the Technology Development Account IIa be invested in firms based outside of Illinois. Requires any Technology Development Account II-Recipient Fund to report the specified additional information to the Treasurer on a quarterly or annual basis as determined by the Treasurer. Removes language prohibiting the State Treasurer from investing more than one-third of Technology Development Account II in any given calendar year. Modifies the purpose of the Act. Makes conforming and technical changes. Defines terms.
Title
TREASURER-TECH DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1081 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 265 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 265 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |