IL SB3203 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0951
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0951
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or before December 31, 2025 that provides coverage for prescription drugs may not deny or limit coverage for prescription inhalers (instead of prescription inhalants) based upon any restriction on the number of days before an inhaler refill may be obtained if, contrary to those restrictions, the inhalants have been ordered or prescribed by the treating physician and are medically appropriate. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2026 that provides coverage for prescription drugs shall limit the total amount that a covered person is required to pay for a covered prescription inhaler to an amount not to exceed $25 per 30-day supply, and provides that nothing in the provisions prevents a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan from reducing a covered person's cost sharing to an amount less than the cap. Makes a conforming change. Provides that coverage for prescription inhalers shall not be subject to any deductible, except to the extent that the coverage would disqualify a high-deductible health plan from eligibility for a health savings account. Authorizes rulemaking and enforcement by the Department of Insurance. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that the program of health benefits shall provide coverage for prescription inhalers under the Illinois Insurance Code.
Title
INS CD-INHALER COVERAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0951 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-021-000 |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 010-005-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 007-003-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |