IL SB3202 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
Pending: House Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
Pending: House Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Bikeway Act. Provides that a municipality or county may prepare a bicycle transportation plan. Specifies the information that must be included in the plan. Defines terms.
Title
BIKEWAY ACT-TRANSPORT PLAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Natalie Toro |