IL SB3198 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a duty of regional superintendents is to inspect the energy conservation measures of schools under the Code. In provisions concerning school energy conservation and savings measures, provides that qualified providers need to be licensed in accordance with the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989, the Professional Engineering Practice Act of 1989, or the Structural Engineering Practice Act of 1989. Provides for procedures for the submission of proposals. Provides for changes made under guaranteed energy savings contracts to be subject to performance reviews. Changes references from "energy or operational cost" to "energy operating cost". Makes changes to various definitions. Makes other changes.
Title
SCH CD-ENERGY CONSERVATION
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 19b-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-14.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3198&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3198.htm |