IL SB3196 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Increases the minimum age at which an alleged delinquent minor may be placed in a detention facility from 10 years of age to 13 years of age.
Title
JUV CT-MINOR-DETENTION AGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3196&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3196.htm |