IL SB3190 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, for policemen born on or after January 1, 1955 but before January 1, 1960, beginning on January 1, 2011, automatic annual increases shall be 3% and such policemen shall not be subject to the 30% maximum increase. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 5-AUTOMATIC INCREAS
Sponsors
Sen. James DeLeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Benefit Enhancements | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3190&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3190.htm |