IL SB3181 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |