IL SB3168 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that records identifying a specific instance of travel by a specific person or vehicle shall be used only as required to ensure the payment and enforcement of tolls, except that such information may be used for specified reasons by State, county, or municipal law enforcement agencies for the comparison of captured license plate data with data held by the Secretary of State, the National Crime Information Center, and the Federal Bureau of Investigation Kidnappings and Missing Persons list. Provides that no data derived from any technology used for an electronic toll collection system under the Act shall be shared with or provided to any law enforcement entity or any law enforcement official without a valid warrant. Provides that certain personally identifiable information generated through the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority's toll collection process shall be used for enforcement purposes only with respect to toll collections. Provides that the Authority shall discard personally identifiable information within 5 years. Provides that the Authority shall make every effort, within practical business and cost constraints, to purge the personal account information of an account that is closed or terminated. Provides that in no case shall the Authority maintain personal information more than 5 years after the date an account is closed or terminated. Provides that the new provisions do not preclude compliance with a court order or settlement agreement that has been approved on or before January 1, 2021. Deletes language providing that the Authority may, within practical business and cost constraints, store personally identifiable information of an electronic toll collection system user only if the information is required to perform account functions such as billing, account settlement, or toll violation enforcement activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOLL HWY-PERSONAL INFORMATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-03-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2020-02-25SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2020-02-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2020-02-19SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-11SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6051019.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback